EP2003785 - RECEPTION DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Takeshi c/o Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
OZEKI, Hiroaki c/o Matsushita Elec. Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
IWAIDA, Mineyuki c/o Matsushita El. Ind. Co., Ltd. IPROC, 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2008/51] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 08720629.8 | 27.03.2008 | [2008/51] | WO2008JP00750 | Priority number, date | JP20070087431 | 29.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007087431 | [2008/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008126360 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2003785 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2003785 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/26, H03H7/20 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H03H7/20 (EP,US);
H04B1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/19] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT DAMIT | [2008/51] | English: | RECEPTION DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2008/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2008 | Translation filed | 16.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 12.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2006319398 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003298356 (SATO TAKURO); | [A]JP2002217682 (NOKIA CORP) | by applicant | JP2003298356 |