EP2165604 - STABLE MICROBIOCIDAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemicrea Inc. 9F, Quattro Muromachi Building, 4-1-6 Nihonbashi-Muromachi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNATSU, Ryoji c/o Chemicrea Inc. 9F Quattro Muromachi Building 4-1-6 Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08720644.7 | 27.03.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008JP00765 | Priority number, date | JP20070144912 | 31.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007144912 | [2010/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008146436 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165604 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01P1/00, A01N43/80, A01N25/22, A01N25/02, A61K31/425 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/80, A01N25/02, A01N25/22, A01N43/80 (EP,US);
A61K31/16, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/425, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2010/12] | A01N25/02, A01N25/22, A01N43/80, A01P1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | STABILE MIKROBIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2010/12] | English: | STABLE MICROBIOCIDAL COMPOSITION | [2010/12] | French: | COMPOSITION MICROBIOCIDE STABLE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2009 | Translation filed | 23.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 14.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP0435439 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 13, line 11 - line 17; table 4 * * claim 7 * * page 5, line 57 - line 58; claim 8 * * page 6, line 1 - line 3; claim 8 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]JP2005187347 (JAPAN ENVIRO CHEMICALS LTD) [Y] 1-15 * example 4; table 1 *; | [Y] - BARMAN B N ET AL, "The effects of ph on the degradation of isothiazolone biocides", vol. 25, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0301-679X(92)90065-U, ISSN 0301-679X, (19920101), pages 281 - 287, TRIBOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC LDT, GUILDFORD, GB, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com, (20030213), XP002001320 [Y] 8,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0301-679X(92)90065-U | International search | [X]JPH03206085 (ROHM & HAAS); | [Y]JPH09202705 (TOOLE KEMI GMBH); | [A]JPH10114605 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [Y]JP2005089348 (KUREASUTAA KK); | [Y]JP2005527626 | by applicant | JP2000072608 | JP2005187347 |