EP2116255 - INTRATHECAL ADMINISTRATION OF HGF AFTER SPINAL CORD INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/46] | THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR SPINAL CORD INJURY | ||
[2012/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keio University 15-45 Mita 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8345 / JP | For all designated states Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | For all designated states Kringle Pharma Inc. 2F Saito Biotechnology Incubator 7-7-15 Saitoasagi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0085 / JP | [2013/17] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Keio University 15-45 Mita 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8345 / JP | ||
For all designated states Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | |||
For all designated states Kringle Pharma Inc. Senri Asahi Hankyu Bldg. 5-3, Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0082 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKANO, Hideyuki c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 02 /
TOYAMA, Yoshiaki c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Masaya c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 04 /
IWANAMI, Akio c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 05 /
KITAMURA, Kazuya c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 06 /
NAKAMURA, Toshikazu Okazakihoshoji-cho 1-4 Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8333 / JP | 07 /
FUNAKOSHI, Hiroshi Grande 18-302, Kamui 3jo 11-2-4 Asahikawa-shi Hokkaido 070-8013 / JP | 08 /
HANADA, Keigo c/o Kringle Pharma Inc. 2F Saito Biotechnology Incubator 7-7-15 Saitoasagi, Iabaraki-shi Osaka 567-0085 / JP | [2013/17] |
Former [2013/15] | 01 /
OKANO, Hideyuki c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | ||
02 /
TOYAMA, Yoshiaki c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, Masaya c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
04 /
IWANAMI, Akio c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
05 /
KITAMURA, Kazuya c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
06 /
NAKAMURA, Toshikazu c/o Osaka University 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | |||
07 /
FUNAKOSHI, Hiroshi c/o Osaka University 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | |||
08 /
HANADA, Keigo c/o Kringle Pharma Inc. Senri Asahi Hankyu Bldg., 5-3 Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0082 / JP | |||
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
OKANO, Hideyuki c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | ||
02 /
TOYAMA, Yoshiaki c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, Masaya c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
04 /
IWANAMI, Akio c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
05 /
KITAMURA, Kazuya c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
06 /
NAKAMURA, Toshikazu c/o Osaka University 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | |||
07 /
FUNAKOSHI, Hiroshi c/o Osaka University 1-1 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | |||
08 /
HANADA, Keigo c/o Kringle Pharma Inc. Senri Asahi Hankyu Bldg., 5-3 Shinsenrihigashimachi 1-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0082 / JP | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/46] | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08721006.8 | 28.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008JP53557 | Priority number, date | WO2007JP53804 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: PCT/JP2007/053804 | [2009/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008105507 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116255 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116255 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K9/08, A61P25/28, A61P25/00, A61K9/00, A61K9/14, A61K9/20, A61K9/50 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
A61K38/1833 (EP,US);
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/0085 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61K9/2063 (EP,US);
A61K9/5026 (EP,US);
A61K9/5031 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | A61K38/22, A61K9/08, A61P25/28, A61P25/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/46] | A61K38/22, A61K9/08, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | INTRATHEKALE VERABREICHUNG VON HGF NACH EINER RÜCKENMARKSVERLETZUNGEN | [2012/43] | English: | INTRATHECAL ADMINISTRATION OF HGF AFTER SPINAL CORD INJURY | [2012/43] | French: | ADMINISTRATION INTRATHÉCALE D'HGF APRÈS UNE LÉSION DE LA MOELLE ÉPINIÈRE | [2012/43] |
Former [2009/46] | MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RÜCKENMARKSVERLETZUNGEN | ||
Former [2009/46] | THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR SPINAL CORD INJURY | ||
Former [2009/46] | AGENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE POUR LÉSION DE LA MOELLE ÉPINIÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2009 | Translation filed | 16.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 31.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2012 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 21.02.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2008 | AT | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | HR | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | MT | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.02.2008 | |
AT | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - KATO N. ET AL., "Nonviral HVJ liposome-mediated retrograde gene transfer of human hepatocyte growth factor into rat nervous system promotes functional and histological recovery of the crushed nerve.", NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 52, pages 299 - 310, XP002629213 [Y] 1-16 * see abstract, page 300 right col., Fig.7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neures.2005.04.004 | [Y] - SHI E. ET AL, "Nonviral gene transfer of hepatocyte growth factor attenuates neurologic injury after spinal cord ischemia in rabbits.", J. THORACIC AND CARDIOVASC. SURGERY, (200610), vol. 132, no. 4, pages 941 - 947, XP002629214 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtcvs.2006.06.018 | International search | [X]WO2006077675 (KRINGLE PHARMA INC [JP], et al); | [X]WO03045439 (ANGES MG INC [JP], et al); | [XP]WO2007032396 (UNIV KEIO [JP], et al) | [X] - KITAMURA H., "Sekizui Sonsho ni Taisuru Hepatocyte Growth Factor no Yukosei no Kento", THE JOURNAL OF THE JAPANESE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATION, (2006), vol. 80, no. 8, page S884, XP003023237 | [X] - KITAMURA K., "Sekizui Sonsho ni Taisuru Hepatocyte Growth Factor no Yokusei no Kento", JOURNAL OF THE JAPAN SPINE RESEARCH SOCIETY, (2006), vol. 17, no. 1, page 557, XP003023238 | [X] - IWANAMI A., "Sekizui Sonsho ni Taisuru Hepatocyte Growth Factor (HGF) no Yukosei no Kento", THE JOURNAL OF THE JAPANESE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATION, (2005), vol. 79, no. 8, page S764, XP003010152 | by applicant | WO03045439 | WO2005100577 | JPH05111382 | JPS6128521 | - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1984), vol. 122, pages 1450 - 1459 | - NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 440 - 443 | - NAT. NEUROSCI., (1999), vol. 2, pages 213 - 217 | - CLIN. CHIM ACTA., (2003), vol. 327, pages 1 - 23 | - THE JOURNAL OF THE JAPANESE ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATION, (20050825), vol. 79, no. 8, page S764 | - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1989), vol. 163, page 967 |