EP2128187 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANABE, Seiichi c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Yoshiaki c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2019/16] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
TANABE, Seiichi c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
ABE, Yoshiaki c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/38] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08721145.4 | 26.02.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008JP53725 | Priority number, date | JP20070046786 | 27.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007046786 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008105553 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128187 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128187 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/00, C08G64/40, G02B3/00, G02C7/02, B29D11/00 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B29D11/00009 (EP,US);
C08G64/40 (KR);
C08G64/406 (EP,US);
C08J5/00 (EP,KR,US);
G02B3/00 (KR);
G02C7/02 (KR);
C08J2369/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | C08J5/00, C08G64/40, G02B3/00, G02C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/16] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN FORMARTIKEL | [2009/49] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED ARTICLE | [2009/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ARTICLE MOULÉ | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2009 | Translation filed | 04.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 16.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 08.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2008 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | NL | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/50] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NL | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 17.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1149852 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8* paragraphs [0011] , [0022] , [0030] - [0033] - [0097] - [0098] *; | [X]EP1156071 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0092] - [0101] - [0107] - [0111]; example 1 *; | [X]US2003195329 (FUNAKOSHI WATARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0055] - [0056] - [0061] - [0064] - [0225] , [0227]; table 1 * | International search | [X]US4383092 (KO ALLEN W, et al); | [X]JPH047329 (DAICEL CHEM); | [X]JPH047328 (DAICEL CHEM); | [X]JPH0472327 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH0488017 (DAICEL CHEM); | [X]JPH07109343 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH11106634 (GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD); | [X]JP2000177845 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [X]JP2000197817 (TEIJIN LTD); | [X]JP2001302782 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [X]JP2003034721 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) | by applicant | JP2001081302 | JP2001192544 |