EP2123681 - POLYROTAXANES AND MATERIAL HAVING POLYROTAXANE, CROSSLINKED POLYROTAXANES AND MATERIAL HAVING THE CROSSLINKED POLYROTAXANE, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THESE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Softmaterials Inc. 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSLIM, Christian c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Mariko c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 03 /
ZHAO, Changming c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2013/03] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
RUSLIM, Christian c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Mariko c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | |||
03 /
ZHAO, Changming c/o ADVANCED SOFTMATERIALS INC. 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08721386.4 | 05.03.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008JP53966 | Priority number, date | JP20070056019 | 06.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007056019 | [2009/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008108411 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123681 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2123681 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08G83/00, A61Q19/00, C08B37/00 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
C08G83/007 (EP,KR,US);
C08B37/0015 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/738 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/24 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/39] | C08B37/16, C08L101/14, A61K8/73, A61K47/40, A61L15/16, A61L27/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/48] | C08B37/16, A61K8/73, A61K47/40, A61L15/16, A61L27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | POLYROTAXANE UND MATERIAL MIT POLYROTAXANEN, VERNETZTE POLYROTAXANE UND MATERIAL MIT DEN VERNETZTEN POLYROTAXANEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2009/48] | English: | POLYROTAXANES AND MATERIAL HAVING POLYROTAXANE, CROSSLINKED POLYROTAXANES AND MATERIAL HAVING THE CROSSLINKED POLYROTAXANE, AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THESE | [2009/48] | French: | POLYROTAXANES ET MATÉRIAU COMPRENANT DU POLYROTAXANE, POLYROTAXANES RÉTICULÉS ET MATÉRIAU COMPRENANT LE POLYROTAXANE RÉTICULÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANTS | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2009 | Translation filed | 03.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 19.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2008 | AT | 16.01.2013 | BE | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | HR | 16.01.2013 | IT | 16.01.2013 | LT | 16.01.2013 | LV | 16.01.2013 | MT | 16.01.2013 | NL | 16.01.2013 | PL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | IE | 05.03.2013 | LU | 05.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | NO | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | ES | 27.04.2013 | IS | 16.05.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
ES | 27.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
NO | 16.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1710269 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [A] 1,18,30,31,36,53 * claims 1,2,5,8,9,10,17 * * column 15, paragraph 44 - paragraph 66 *; | [A]EP1707587 (UNIV TOKYO [JP]) [A] 1,36,53,54 * claims 1,2,21,23 * * column 24, paragraph 60 - column 25, paragraph 62 * * page 27, paragraph 72 - page 31, paragraph 89 * | [A] - ARAKI J ET AL, "Polyrotaxane derivatives. I. Preparation of modified polyrotaxanes with nonionic functional groups and their solubility in organic solvents", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE. PART A, POLYMER CHEMISTRY, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (20061101), vol. 44, no. 21, doi:10.1002/POLA.21717, ISSN 0887-624X, pages 6312 - 6323, XP008101850 [A] 1 * Scheme 1; page 6318 * * page 6321; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/POLA.21717 | International search | [Y]WO2005080469 (ITO KOHZO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-59 * , Claims 1 to 29 & EP 1707587 A1 & CA 2552835 A *; | [Y]WO2005080470 (ITO KOHZO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-59 * , Claims 1 to 37 & EP 1710269 A1 & CA 2552837 A *; | [Y]WO2006088200 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-59 * , Claims 1 to 28 & EP 1852454 A1 * | [Y] - ARAKI, JUN et al., "Polyrotaxane derivatives. I. Preparation of modified polyrotaxanes with nonionic functional groups and their solubility in organic solvents", Journal of Polymer Science , Part A: Polymer Chemistry, (20060000), vol. 44, no. 21, pages 6312 - 6323, XP055170455 [Y] 1-59 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pola.21717 | by applicant | JP3475252B | WO2005080469 | WO2005080470 | WO2005052026 | WO2005008469 | - MACROMOLECULES, (1993), vol. 26, pages 5698 - 5703 |