EP2145972 - HIGHLY THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd. 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki -shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | For all designated states Local Incorporated Administrative Agency Technology Research Institute of Osaka Prefecture 7-1, Ayumino 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka / JP | [2013/33] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd. 1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki -shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | ||
For all designated states OSAKA PREFECTURAL GOVERNMENT 1-22, Otemae 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-0008 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAGIRI, Kazuaki c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd. 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Akiyuki c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd. 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 03 /
IMANISHI, Terumitsu c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd. 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Toyohiro c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd. 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 05 /
NAKAMA, Nobuhito c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd. 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | 06 /
KAKITSUJI, Atsushi c/o Technology Research Institute of Osaka Prefecture 7-1 Ayumino 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1157 / JP | 07 /
SASAKI, Katsuhiko 4-2-16 Chuo 3-chome Shiroishi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 003-0000 / JP | [2013/26] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
KATAGIRI, Kazuaki c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co. Ltd 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMIZU, Akiyuki c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co. Ltd 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | |||
03 /
IMANISHI, Terumitsu c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co. Ltd 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | |||
04 /
SATO, Toyohiro c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co. Ltd 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKAMA, Nobuhito c/o Sumitomo Precision Products Co. Ltd 1-10 Fusou-cho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP | |||
06 /
KAKITSUJI, Atsushi c/o Technology Research Institute of Osaka Prefecture 7-1 Ayumino 2-chome Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1157 / JP | |||
07 /
SASAKI, Katsuhiko 4-2-16 Chuo 3-chome Shiroishi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 003-0000 / JP | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/06] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08721458.1 | 06.03.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008JP54038 | Priority number, date | JP20070108157 | 17.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007108157 | JP20070167105 | 26.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007167105 | [2010/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008129906 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145972 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2145972 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C22C49/14, C01B31/02, C04B35/64, C04B35/80, C22C49/02, C22C49/06, C22C49/08, C22C49/11, C22C47/14, C22C101/10, B32B5/02, C04B35/645, C04B35/83, B82Y30/00 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
C22C47/025 (EP,US);
C22C49/14 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/02 (KR);
B32B5/30 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/15 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/111 (EP,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/5607 (EP,US);
C04B35/5611 (EP,US);
C04B35/5626 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/58014 (EP,US);
C04B35/58071 (EP,US);
C04B35/58078 (EP,US);
C04B35/581 (EP,US);
C04B35/587 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B35/83 (EP,KR,US);
C22C47/14 (EP,KR,US);
C22C49/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C49/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C49/08 (EP,KR,US);
C22C49/11 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2264/105 (EP,US);
B32B2264/107 (EP,US);
B32B2307/302 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/714 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5248 (EP,US);
C04B2235/526 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5264 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5268 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5288 (EP,US);
C04B2235/666 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
Y10S977/742 (EP,US);
Y10S977/776 (EP,US);
Y10S977/777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249927 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | C22C49/14, C01B31/02, C04B35/64, C04B35/80, C22C49/02, C22C49/06, C22C49/08, C22C49/11, C22C47/14, C22C101/10, B32B5/02, C04B35/645, C04B35/83 | ||
Former IPC [2010/03] | C22C49/14, C01B31/02, C04B35/64, C04B35/80, C22C49/02, C22C49/06, C22C49/08, C22C49/11, C22C47/14, C22C101/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | VERBUNDWERKSTOFF MIT HOHER WÄRMELEITFÄHIGKEIT | [2010/03] | English: | HIGHLY THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2010/03] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE DOTÉ D'UNE CONDUCTIVITÉ THERMIQUE ÉLEVÉE | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2009 | Translation filed | 07.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 09.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2008 | AT | 25.09.2013 | BE | 25.09.2013 | BG | 25.09.2013 | CY | 25.09.2013 | CZ | 25.09.2013 | DK | 25.09.2013 | EE | 25.09.2013 | ES | 25.09.2013 | FI | 25.09.2013 | HR | 25.09.2013 | IT | 25.09.2013 | LT | 25.09.2013 | LV | 25.09.2013 | MC | 25.09.2013 | MT | 25.09.2013 | NL | 25.09.2013 | PL | 25.09.2013 | RO | 25.09.2013 | SE | 25.09.2013 | SI | 25.09.2013 | SK | 25.09.2013 | TR | 25.09.2013 | NO | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.12.2013 | IS | 25.01.2014 | PT | 27.01.2014 | IE | 06.03.2014 | LU | 06.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.03.2008 | |
AT | 25.09.2013 | ||
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MC | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
BG | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
MT | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
DK | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
IT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
PT | 27.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CY | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 25.09.2013 | |
BE | 25.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
ES | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
PL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
CZ | 25.09.2013 | ||
EE | 25.09.2013 | ||
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
SK | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
NL | 25.09.2013 | ||
RO | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 25.09.2013 | |
FI | 25.09.2013 | ||
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 25.09.2013 | |
HR | 25.09.2013 | ||
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
LV | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
SI | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 25.09.2013 | |
LT | 25.09.2013 | ||
SE | 25.09.2013 | ||
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 25.09.2013 | |
NO | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2006120803 (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003012939 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO2005040067 (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2006120803 (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006051782 (SHIMANE PREFECTURAL GOVERNMENT [JP], et al); | [A]JP2006144030 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) | by applicant | WO2006120803 |