EP2133090 - GROWTH HORMONE SECRETION STIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Megmilk Snow Brand Co., Ltd. 1-1, Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 0650043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Megmilk Snow Brand Co., Ltd. 1-1, Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi Hakkaido 0650043 / JP | ||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Snow Brand Milk Products Co., Ltd. 1-1 Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONO, Aiko c/o Snow Brand Milk Products Co. Ltd. 1-1-2 Minamidai Kawagoe-shi Saitama 350-1165 / JP | 02 /
MATSUYAMA, Hiroaki c/o Snow Brand Milk Products Co. Ltd. 1-1-2 Minamidai Kawagoe-shi Saitama 350-1165 / JP | 03 /
MORITA, Yoshikazu c/o Snow Brand Milk Products Co. Ltd. 1-1-2 Minamidai Kawagoe-shi Saitama 350-1165 / JP | 04 /
SERIZAWA, Atsushi c/o Snow Brand Milk Products Co. Ltd. 1-1-2 Minamidai Kawagoe-shi Saitama 350-1165 / JP | 05 /
HIGURASHI, Satoshi c/o Snow Brand Milk Products Co. Ltd. 1-1-2 Minamidai Kawagoe-shi Saitama 350-1165 / JP | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08721754.3 | 11.03.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008JP54338 | Priority number, date | JP20070062372 | 12.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007062372 | [2009/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008111573 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133090 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/01, A61P5/06, A23L1/00 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
A61K38/018 (EP,US);
A61K38/40 (KR);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L2/66 (EP,US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A61K35/20 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/02 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/51] | A61K38/00, A61P5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | WACHSTUMSHORMON-SEKRETIONSSTIMULATOR | [2009/51] | English: | GROWTH HORMONE SECRETION STIMULATOR | [2009/51] | French: | STIMULATEUR DE SÉCRÉTION D'HORMONE DE CROISSANCE | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2009 | Translation filed | 29.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 23.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 21.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/17] | 09.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0704218 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 18 - line 31 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0786473 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * claim - *; | [X]US2006040025 (SOUPPE JEROME [FR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0099] * * example 1 * * claim - *; | [X]US2006247162 (MORITA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * example - ** claim - *; | [X]WO2006126758 (REXGENEBIOTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 3 - line 8 * * page 11, line 8 - line 9 * * page 12, line 18 - line 20 * * page 22, line 2 - line 7 * * examples 1,2 * * claim - * | International search | [A]WO9200994 (GROPEP PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]JPH11315014 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD); | [A]JP2002212096 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD); | [A]JP2002212097 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD); | [A]JP2004115509 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD); | [A]JP2006347946 (FUJI OIL CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS61246198 | JPS63255300 | JPS6486839 | JPH05202098 | WO2004004772 | JP2005507949 | JP2005082489 | JP2005535707 | - NATURE, (1999), vol. 402, pages 656 - 660 | - NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 194 - 198 |