EP2128292 - IRON-BASED SOFT MAGNETIC ALLOY, THIN RIBBON OF AMORPHOUS ALLOY, AND MAGNETIC PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8614 / JP | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIZAWA, Yoshihito c/o Advanced Electronics Research Laboratory HITACHI METALS LTD. 5200 Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi Saitama 360-0843 / JP | 02 /
OHTA, Motoki c/o Advanced Electronics Research Laboratory HITACHI METALS LTD. 5200 Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi Saitama 360-0843 / JP | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2009/51] |
Former [2009/49] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08721946.5 | 12.03.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008JP54530 | Priority number, date | JP20070068869 | 16.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007068869 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008114665 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128292 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D6/00, C22C45/02, H01F1/14, H01F1/153 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
C22C45/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01F1/14 (KR);
C21D6/00 (EP,US);
C21D8/12 (EP,US);
C22C1/00 (EP,US);
C22C33/003 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US);
H01F1/153 (KR);
H01F1/15308 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | WEICHE MAGNETISCHE LEGIERUNG AUF EISENBASIS, DÜNNES BAND AUS EINER AMORPHEN LEGIERUNG UND MAGNETISCHES ELEMENT | [2009/49] | English: | IRON-BASED SOFT MAGNETIC ALLOY, THIN RIBBON OF AMORPHOUS ALLOY, AND MAGNETIC PART | [2009/49] | French: | ALLIAGE MAGNÉTIQUE DOUX À BASE DE FER, RUBAN MINCE D'ALLIAGE AMORPHE ET PIÈCE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2009 | Translation filed | 09.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 28.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2007077651 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020] * * table 2 *; | [E]EP1925686 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0052]; tables 1-11 ** cited by ISA *; | US2009065100 [ ] (YOSHIZAWA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JPH07201610 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [Y]JP2004353090 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [Y]JP2006040906 (MAKINO TERUHIRO, et al); | [Y]WO2006109813 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2007032531 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) | Examination | US6425960 | JP2012090746 |