EP2124077 - POLYMER CLAD OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Kenji c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Junichi c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2014/27] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
OKADA, Kenji c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI, Junichi c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/48] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08722180.0 | 14.03.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008JP54784 | Priority number, date | JP20070068761 | 16.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007068761 | [2009/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008114742 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2124077 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2124077 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00, G02B6/036, // G02B6/02 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/02033 (EP,US);
G02B6/03605 (EP,US);
G02B6/03627 (EP,US);
G02B6/03633 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | G02B6/00, G02B6/036 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2014/27] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYMERKASCHIERTE GLASFASER | [2009/48] | English: | POLYMER CLAD OPTICAL FIBER | [2009/48] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE À GAINE POLYMÈRE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | Translation filed | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 03.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10282353 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]EP1022592 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP0883001 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH1164665 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A] - KUBO U. ET AL., "Hikari Fiber no Teion Ryoiki ni okeru Laser Denso Tokusei (II)", JOURNAL OF THE FACULUTY OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, KINKI UNIVERSITY, (19870930), no. 23, pages 193 - 196, XP008103305 | by applicant | JP2005321686 | JPH1164665 | JPH11119036 |