Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8304043 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2012 | B2 | US2009258196 | 15.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007069400 | 16.03.2007 | WO2008JP55184 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2125381 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B1 | EP2125381 | 15.08.2012 | A4 | EP2125381 | 02.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007069400 | 16.03.2007 | WO2008JP55184 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101541549B | 24.10.2012 | B | CN101541549 | 23.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007069400 | 16.03.2007 | WO2008JP55184 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1131593 | 29.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007069400 | 16.03.2007 | WO2008JP55184 | 14.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008114849 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007069400 | 16.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5170508B | Global Dossier | 27.03.2013 | B2 | JP2008229909 | 02.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007069400 | 16.03.2007 |