EP2137014 - DEVICE FOR PREVENTING SLIPPING OF VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Park, Il Jun 106-703 Daelim Apt. 415-1 Susaek-dong, Eunpyeong-gu Seoul 122-755 / KR | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08723307.8 | 06.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008KR01270 | Priority number, date | KR20070023109 | 08.03.2007 Original published format: KR 20070023109 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008108586 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2137014 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/06, B60C27/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B60C27/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES RUTSCHENS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2010/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR PREVENTING SLIPPING OF VEHICLE | [2010/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR INTERDIRE LE PATINAGE DE VÉHICULE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 05.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 08.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 16.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | EP11184343.9 / EP2439087 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006049403 (PARK IL JUN [KR]) [A] 1,8-15* paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0081]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]KR200424423Y (PARK IL-JUN) [A] 1,8-15 * figure - * | International search | [A]JPH09323516 (KOJIYOU SANGYO UNYU KK); | [A]KR200289488Y ; | [A]US6725894 (CLARK LARRY C [US]); | [A]KR200424423Y ; | [AP]KR20080013695 (SCS SYSTEMS CO LTD [KR]) |