EP2121895 - PHOTO BIOREACTOR WITH LIGHT DISTRIBUTOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A PHOTOSYNTHETIC CULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feyecon B.V. Bos en Vaartstraat 11 2012 LG Haarlem / NL | [2010/44] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Feyecon Development & Implementation B.V. Rijnkade 17a 1382 GS Weesp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOERLEE, Geert Feye Bos en Vaartstraat 11 NL-2012 LG Haarlem / NL | 02 /
SIEWERS, Ernst-Jan Nassaulaan 1 NL-1815 GG Alkmaar / NL | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/50] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/48] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08723905.9 | 19.03.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008NL50154 | Priority number, date | EP20070104403 | 19.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07104403 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008115058 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2121895 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121895 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12N1/12, G02B6/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C12M41/10 (EP,US);
C12M21/02 (EP,US);
C12M23/02 (EP,US);
C12M23/56 (EP,US);
C12M31/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | LICHTBIOREAKTOR MIT LICHTVERTEILER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PHOTOSYNTHETISCHEN KULTUR | [2009/48] | English: | PHOTO BIOREACTOR WITH LIGHT DISTRIBUTOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A PHOTOSYNTHETIC CULTURE | [2009/48] | French: | BIORÉACTEUR PHOTO AVEC RÉPARTITEUR DE LUMIÈRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE CULTURE PHOTOSYNTHÉTIQUE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 15.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2008 | AT | 12.12.2012 | BE | 12.12.2012 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | HR | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MT | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | NO | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | LU | 19.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
NO | 12.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4103059 (KAUTZ GLENN E) [X] 25-28,30* figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [X]WO7900282 (KIUCHI A, et al) [X] 1-25,29,31-37 * abstract *; | [X]EP0085926 (MORI KEI) [X] 15-25 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 7 * * figures 4a-5c *; | [X]WO9015953 (FACULTE POLYTECHNIQUE DE MONS [BE]) [X] 15-25 * claims 1-23 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPH089809 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-37 * paragraph [0007]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US6287852 (KONDO JIRO [JP], et al) [X] 15-24 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 64 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6509188 (TROESCH WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-37 * column 2, line 44 - line 65; figures 1a,1b *; | [X]WO2005066552 (AGROTECHNOLOGY AND FOOD INNOVA [NL], et al) [X] 25-28,30 * figures 1-5c; claim 1 * |