EP2145316 - VECTOR-BASED IMAGE PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKENINE-MÖLLER, Tomas Rosenvägen 13 S-227 38 Lund / SE | 02 /
MUNKBERG, Jacob c/o Örtergren Disponentgatan 10C S-211 57 Malmö / SE | 03 /
STRÖM, Jacob Heleneborgsgatan 6C S-117 32 Stockholm / SE | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Sjölander, Henrik, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 08724256.6 | 19.03.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008SE50309 | Priority number, date | US20070907492P | 04.04.2007 Original published format: US 907492 P | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008123823 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145316 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/20, G06T9/00 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
G06T9/005 (EP,US);
G06T9/00 (EP,US);
G06T9/008 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/03] | G06T15/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | AUF VEKTOREN BERUHENDE BILDBEARBEITUNG | [2010/03] | English: | VECTOR-BASED IMAGE PROCESSING | [2010/03] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE VECTORIEL | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 15.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2007010648 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [I] 5,10,16,20 * page 18 - page 19; figure 9 * [A] 1-4,11-15,17-19; | [A]US2004151372 (RESHETOV ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]EP1376472 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [AP]WO2007123452 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [AP]WO2007084062 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) | [A] - YAMASAKI T. ET AL., "Fast and Efficient Normal MAP Compression Based on Vector Quantization", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20060514), pages II9 - II12, XP031100526 |