EP2137085 - CONTAINER FOR GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConveyEx AB Gertruds Gata 33 421 67 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2014/35] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Crossborder Aero Technologies AB Löddesnäsvägen 3 237 41 Bjärred / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORDSTRÖM, Claes Mäster Eriks väg 4A S-224 67 Lund / SE | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/46] | Valea AB Anna Lindhs Plats 4 211 19 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2010/20] | Valea AB Anna Lindhs Plats 4 211 19 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Nikolopoulou, Sofia, et al Zacco Sweden AB Patent Department P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08724258.2 | 19.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008SE50311 | Priority number, date | SE20070000778 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: SE 0700778 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008118077 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2137085 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2137085 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/14, B65D88/24, B65D88/52 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
B65D88/14 (EP,US);
B65D88/24 (EP,SE,US);
B65D88/52 (EP,US);
B65D90/021 (SE);
B65D90/205 (SE)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | B65D88/24, B65D90/02, B65D90/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR WAREN | [2010/01] | English: | CONTAINER FOR GOODS | [2010/01] | French: | CONTENANT POUR MARCHANDISES | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 10.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2013 | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2008 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BE | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | ES | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | IT | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | LU | 19.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 19.03.2008 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2913029 (KING PATON HAMILFON NEIL); | [X]US3349574 (GLASER PETER E); | [A]US3474803 (DAVIS EPHRAIM F); | [X]GB1191921 (HICKEY CHRISTOPHER DANIEL DOWL); | [A]US3548904 (MACKELL BERNARD B); | [A]US3552466 (FAIRCHILDS BERT S); | [A]US3999727 (RENNEMANN ALBERT); | [A]DE3702798 (MITTELMANN GERHARD [DE]); | [A]DE9402589U (DEMIREL KAMIL [DE]); | [A]WO03101853 (BUTTLE RITCHIE JAMES [ZA]) | International search | [A]US3557855 (WEINGARTEN JOSEPH L, et al); | [A]US3578050 (WEINGARTEN JOSEPH L, et al); | [A]US3659641 (MARINO FRANK J); | [A]GB2026985 (ALUSUISSE); | [A]US5267665 (SANAI MOHSEN [US], et al); | [A]EP0822152 (EUROP AVIAT PRODUCTS SRL [IT]); | [A]DE29801224U (MENZEL WERNER [DE]); | [A]US5941405 (SCALES PETER BRUCE [CA], et al) |