06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
20.05.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
18.06.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
11.06.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
31.05.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.02.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
26.02.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
15.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.06.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.10.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.10.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.10.2017 |
First examination report |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.06.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.12.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
27.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
27.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
02.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
10.12.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
26.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|