EP2111133 - DEVICE FOR CREATING A SEAL BETWEEN FABRICS AND/OR OTHER MATERIALS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEAGER, Benjamin 235 Turtle Way Bozeman, MT 59715 / US | 02 /
McCUNE, Matt 3917 Sourdough Road Bozeman, MT 59715 / US | [2009/51] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
MEAGER, Benjamin 1204 West Alderson Street Bozeman, MT 59715 / US | ||
02 /
McCUNE, Matt 3917 Sourdough Road Bozeman, MT 59715 / US | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2009/37] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 08724482.8 | 11.01.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008US00401 | Priority number, date | US20070884559P | 11.01.2007 Original published format: US 884559 P | US20080972106 | 10.01.2008 Original published format: US 972106 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008088742 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111133 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/16 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
A44B19/16 (EP,KR,US);
A41F1/00 (EP,US);
A41H37/003 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45215 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERSCHLUSSNAHT ZWISCHEN TEXTILSTOFFEN UND/ODER ANDEREN MATERIALIEN SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/44] | English: | DEVICE FOR CREATING A SEAL BETWEEN FABRICS AND/OR OTHER MATERIALS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [2009/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR CREER UN JOINT ETANCHE ENTRE DES TISSUS ET/OU AUTRES MATERIAUX ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2009/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]BE514547 (S G HAGELTORN) [X] 1-7,11-14 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 22; figures 1-13 *; | [X]GB899875 (ALBERT LANDRICHTER, et al) [X] 1-7,11-14 * page 2, line 45 - line 130; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2266660 (WALKER AND HOMER GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1-7,11-14 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 10; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2797463 (DORMAN LEONARD M, et al) [X] 1,8-10 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 65; figures 3,4 * |