EP2117935 - PUMPS FOR VACUUM CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTI Industries, Inc 22160 N. Pepper Rd. Barrington, IL 60010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Cti Industries, Inc 22160 N. Pepper Rd. Barrington, IL 60010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Brent 22160 N. Pepper Rd. Barrington, IL 60010 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Probert, Gareth David Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Probert, Gareth David Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08725218.5 | 05.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US01557 | Priority number, date | US20070899513P | 05.02.2007 Original published format: US 899513 P | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008097566 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117935 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65B31/06, F04B39/10 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
F04B33/00 (EP,US);
B65D77/225 (EP,US);
B65D2205/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | PUMPEN FÜR VAKUUMBEHÄLTER | [2009/47] | English: | PUMPS FOR VACUUM CONTAINERS | [2009/47] | French: | POMPES POUR CONTENEURS SOUS VIDE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 22.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4975028 (SCHULTZ GLEN R [US]) |