|
16.10.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
29.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
23.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.05.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
16 |