EP2117687 - METHOD OF MAKING AN INORGANIC MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/47] | INORGANIC MEMBRANES AND METHOD OF MAKING | ||
[2018/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [2018/50] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEKETY, Curtis, R 8 Park Street Tioga, PA 16946 / US | 02 /
LIU, Wei 1122 Cromwell Avenue Richland, WA 99352 / US | 03 /
SONG, Zhen 3507 Conhocton Road Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 04 /
WHALEN, Joseph, M 4 Birch View Drive Halifax, Nova Scotia, B3P2N1 / CA | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2018/50] |
Former [2009/47] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm Weilnau Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm GbR Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 D-65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08725756.4 | 19.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US02157 | Priority number, date | US20070903637P | 27.02.2007 Original published format: US 903637 P | US20070894065 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: US 894065 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008106028 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117687 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117687 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, B01D67/00, C04B41/50 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B01D67/0046 (EP,US);
B01D71/025 (EP,US);
B01D2323/081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2018/50] |
Former [2011/14] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ANORGANISCHEN MEMBRANEN | [2018/30] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING AN INORGANIC MEMBRANE | [2018/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MEMBRANES INORGANIQUES | [2018/25] |
Former [2009/47] | ANORGANISCHE MEMBRANEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2009/47] | INORGANIC MEMBRANES AND METHOD OF MAKING | ||
Former [2009/47] | MEMBRANES INORGANIQUES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 29.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6225246 (DARCOVICH KEN [CA]); | [XY]US6841497 (KRELL ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [X]WO2006034717 (UNIV DANMARKS TEKNISKE [DK], et al); | Examination | US4968426 |