EP2115028 - RESIN-POLYESTER BLEND BINDER COMPOSITIONS, METHOD OF MAKING SAME AND ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexion Specialty Chemicals Research Belgium S.A. Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Ottignies Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | For all designated states Hexion Specialty Chemicals Research Belgium S.A. Avenue Jean Monnet 1 Ottignies, Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | ||
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc. 180 East Broad Street Columbus OH 43215 / US | ||
For all designated states Momentive Specialty Chemicals Research Belgium S.A. Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Ottignies Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | |||
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc. 180 East Broad Street Columbus OH 43215 / US | ||
For all designated states Hexion Specialty Chemicals Research Belgium S.A. Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Ottignies Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINER, Gregory, D. 1550 Old Ford Road New Albany, IN 47150 / US | 02 /
BEAR, Jeremiah 13800 Fancy Gap Drive Louisville, KY 40299 / US | 03 /
MCNEAL, Thomas, L. 850 Washburn Avenue Louisville, KY 40222 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/04] |
Former [2009/46] | van der Straaten, Jan Anthony Hexion Specialty Chemicals Research Belgium S.A. IP Section Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Ottignies-Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | Application number, filing date | 08726094.9 | 26.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008US02511 | Priority number, date | US20070903475P | 26.02.2007 Original published format: US 903475 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008106124 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2115028 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2115028 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/12, C08K3/40 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
B24D3/285 (EP,US);
C08G63/6884 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08L61/24 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C09D161/24 (US);
C09D167/02 (US);
C08G63/6886 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L61/24, C08L2666/18 (EP,US);
C08L67/00, C08L2666/16 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BINDUNG EINER HARZ-POLYESTER-MISCHUNG, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND ARTIKEL DARAUS | [2009/46] | English: | RESIN-POLYESTER BLEND BINDER COMPOSITIONS, METHOD OF MAKING SAME AND ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM | [2009/46] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE LIANT DE MÉLANGE RÉSINE-POLYESTER, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLES-CI ET ARTICLES FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 06.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2008 | AT | 28.01.2015 | BE | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | IE | 26.02.2015 | LU | 26.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | PT | 28.05.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.02.2008 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 28.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4493872 (FUNDERBURK F GENE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 1, line 5 - column 6, line 22; example -; claims 1-26 * | International search | [A]US4145469 (NEWKIRK DAVID D, et al); | [X]US4493872 (FUNDERBURK F GENE [US], et al); | [A]US4888381 (PANKRATZ RICHARD P [US]); | [A]US2003148106 (MA JINGWEN [US], et al); | [Y]US2004159654 (RYAN WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [Y]US2007039703 (LEE JERRY H [US], et al) | by applicant | US1910444 | US2906660 | US3012929 | US3041156 | US3050427 | US3103461 | US3228825 | US3734874 | US3760458 | US3766003 | US3779993 | US3838995 | US3905067 | US4233196 | US4258098 | US4304901 | US4314827 | US4560612 | US4623364 | US4744802 | US4770671 | US4881951 | US4917764 | US4997461 | US5009675 | US5011508 | US5085671 | US5213591 | US5290631 | US5334648 | US5342877 | US5362842 | US5369210 | US5389716 | US5518586 | US5646237 | US5698302 | US5698304 | US5704952 | US5709940 | US5733952 | US5772846 | US5804254 | US5851933 | US5912281 | US5914365 | US6344503 | US6384116 | US6544911 | US6582819 | US6642299 | US6682574 | US2005191922 | - McCutcheon's Emulsifiers & Detergents, MC PUBLISHING CO., (1993), page 20 |