30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
07.09.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
01.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
25.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
24.02.2012 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
20.01.2012 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
04.11.2011 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
30.09.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
25.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.07.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
06.07.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.05.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
27.05.2011 |
Change - German title |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
27.05.2011 |
Change - English title |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
27.05.2011 |
Change - French title |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
25.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
06.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.03.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
09.10.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
09.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
23.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|