Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8900820 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2014 | B2 | US2012094311 | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113334881 | 22.12.2011 | US28439708 | 22.09.2008 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | US7265108 | 27.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8129125 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2012 | B2 | US2011189691 | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28439708 | 22.09.2008 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | US7265108 | 27.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8088589 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2012 | B2 | US2009263819 | 22.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48007609 | 08.06.2009 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | US7265108 | 27.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008206777 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | US7265108 | 27.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2413142 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2013 | B1 | EP2413142 | 01.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08726179 | 27.02.2008 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2114990 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2012 | B9 | EP2114990 | 02.11.2011 | B1 | EP2114990 | 07.04.2010 | A4 | EP2114990 | 11.11.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US02602 | 27.02.2008 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE531725T | 15.11.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US02602 | 27.02.2008 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2114990T | 07.05.2012 | T5 | DK2114990T | 16.01.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US02602 | 27.02.2008 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2413142T | 22.07.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP08726179 | 27.02.2008 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2376978T | 21.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US02602 | 27.02.2008 | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008106175 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2008 | A3 | WO2008106175 | 04.09.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2412432T | 11.07.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US90369407 | 27.02.2007 | Type | Divisional application | EP2413142 |