EP2114990 - Method for predicting the response of NSCLC-patients to treatment by an EGFR-TK inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/46] | GENE AND PROTEIN EXPRESSION PROFILES ASSOCIATED WITH THE THERAPEUTIC EFFICACY OF EGFR-TK INHIBITORS | ||
[2011/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuclea Biomarkers LLC 46 Elm Street Pittsfield, MA 01210 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Nuclea Biomarkers LLC 105 South Street Pittsfield, MA 01201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURACA, Patrick, J. 8A Stratford Avenue Pittsfield, MA 01201 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08726179.8 | 27.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008US02602 | Priority number, date | US20070903694P | 27.02.2007 Original published format: US 903694 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008106175 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2114990 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2114990 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2114990 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
G01N2333/71 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vorhersage ob NSCLC-Patienten auf eine Behandlung mit einem EGFR-TK-Hemmer ansprechen | [2011/26] | English: | Method for predicting the response of NSCLC-patients to treatment by an EGFR-TK inhibitor | [2011/26] | French: | Méthode de prédiction de la réponse à un traitment par un inhibiteur de tyrosine kinase du récepteur à l'EGF des patients atteints de carcinome non à petites cellules | [2011/26] |
Former [2009/46] | MIT DER THERAPEUTISCHEN WIRKUNG VON EGFR-TK-HEMMERN ASSOZIIERTE GEN- UND PROTEINEXPRESSIONSPROFILE | ||
Former [2009/46] | GENE AND PROTEIN EXPRESSION PROFILES ASSOCIATED WITH THE THERAPEUTIC EFFICACY OF EGFR-TK INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2009/46] | PROFILS D'EXPRESSION DE GENES ET DE PROTEINES ASSOCIES A L'EFFICACITE THERAPEUTIQUE D'INHIBITEURS EGFR-TK | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 24.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11008690.7 / EP2413142 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | LU | 27.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - BALKO J M ET AL, "Gene expression patterns that predict sensitivity to epidermal growth factor receptor tyrosine kinase inhibitors in lung cancer cell lines and human lung tumors", BMC GENOMICS, (20061110), vol. 7, no. 1, page 289, XP021022254 [X] 1 * the whole document, in particular abstract; paragraph 1 and 5 of "Discussion"; additional file 3 * [A] 4-5 [I] 2-3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2164-7-289 | [ ] - BALKO J ET AL, "Additional File 3: Genes 51-180 of the EGFR TKI sensitivity expression signature", BMC Genomics, (20061110), URL: http://www.biomedcentral.com/content/supplementary/1471-2164-7-289-S3.doc, (20100118), XP002563766 [ ] * page 2, row "EGFR" * | [A] - HAN S-W ET AL, "Epidermal growth factor receptor (EGFR) downstream molecules as response predictive markers for gefitinib (Iressa(R), ZD1839) in chemotherapy-resistant non-small cell lung cancer", INT J CANCER, (20050101), vol. 113, no. 1, pages 109 - 115, XP002563767 [A] 6-8 * the whole document, in particular abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.20550 | [A] - CAPPUZZO F ET AL, "Akt phosphorylation and gefitinib efficacy in patients with advanced non-small-cell lung cancer", J NATL CANCER INST, (20040804), vol. 96, no. 15, pages 1133 - 1141, XP002563768 [A] 6-8 * the whole document, in particular abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/djh217 | International search | [X] - MIYAKAWA et al., "Increased expression of phosphorylated p70S6 kinase and Akt in papillary thyroid cancer tissues.", Endocrine J, (20030000), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 77 - 83, XP008115300 [X] 1 * See entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1507/endocrj.50.77 |