EP2126130 - CULTURES WITH IMPROVED PHAGE RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MT | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 Postboks 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Dupont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states DANISCO A/S Langebrogade 1 1001 Copenhagen / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRANGOU, Rodolphe 4818 Valor Way Madison, WI 53718 / US | 02 /
FREMAUX, Christophe 19 Rue des Joncs 86000 Poitiers / FR | 03 /
HORVATH, Philippe 13 rue Marcel Leideck 86230 Saint-Gervais-les-3-Clochers / FR | 04 /
ROMERO, Dennis 126 Amanda Court Oregon, WI 53575 / US | 05 /
BOYAVAL, Patrick Les Ruisselees 35520 La Mézière / FR | [2014/26] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
BARRANGOU, Rodolphe 4818 Valor Way Madison, Wisconsin 53718 / US | ||
02 /
FREMAUX, Christophe 19 Rue des Joncs F-86000 Poitiers / FR | |||
03 /
HORVATH, Philippe 13 rue Marcel Leideck F-86230 Saint-Gervais-les-3-Clochers / FR | |||
04 /
ROMERO, Dennis 126 Amanda Court Oregon, Wisconsin 53575 / US | |||
05 /
BOYAVAL, Patrick Les Ruisselees F-35520 La Mézière / FR | |||
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
BARRANGOU, Rodolphe 4818 Valor Way Madison, Wisconsin 53718 / US | ||
02 /
FREMAUX, Christophe 8 Rue des Jones F-86000 Poitiers / FR | |||
03 /
HORVATH, Philippe 13 rue Marcel Leideck F-86230 Saint-Gervais-les-3-Clochers / FR | |||
04 /
ROMERO, Dennis 126 Amanda Court Oregon, Wisconsin 53575 / US | |||
05 /
BOYAVAL, Patrick Les Ruisselees F-35520 La Mézière / FR | |||
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
BARRANGOU, Rodolphe 4818 Valor Way Madison, Wisconsin 53718 / US | ||
02 /
FREMAUX, Christophe 8 Rue des Jones F-86000 Poitiers / FR | |||
03 /
HORVATH, Philippe 8 Rue des Sablons F-86140 Scorbe-Clairvaux / FR | |||
04 /
ROMERO, Dennis 126 Amanda Court Oregon, Wisconsin 53575 / US | |||
05 /
BOYAVAL, Patrick Les Ruisselees F-35520 La Mézière / FR | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 08726285.3 | 29.02.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US02714 | Priority number, date | US20070904721P | 02.03.2007 Original published format: US 904721 P | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008108989 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2126130 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2126130 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A23C9/123 (EP,US);
C12N15/746 (RU,US);
A23C9/1238 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,RU,US);
C12Q1/70 (EP,RU,US);
A23C2220/202 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/70, C12Q2525/151 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KULTUREN MIT VERBESSERTER PHAGENRESISTENZ | [2009/49] | English: | CULTURES WITH IMPROVED PHAGE RESISTANCE | [2009/49] | French: | CULTURES POSSEDANT UNE RÉSISTANCE AUX PHAGES AMÉLIORÉE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.04.2014 | 01.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12150760.2 / EP2489275 | EP14195132.7 / EP2860267 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 25.03.2015 | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/47] | MC | 25.03.2015 | |
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | MC | 25.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007025097 (DANISCO [DK], et al); | [PX]WO2007136815 (DANISCO [DK], et al); | Examination | US5593885 | by applicant | US4621058 | US2003219778 | WO2007025097 |