EP2134665 - MECHANICAL PROCESS FOR CREATING PARTICLES IN A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 5th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASON, Thomas G. 10425 Colina Way Los Angeles, California 90077 / US | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08727029.4 | 20.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008US03679 | Priority number, date | US20070918896P | 20.03.2007 Original published format: US 918896 P | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008115550 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134665 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/50, C07F7/18 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
C23C14/0005 (EP);
B01J13/00 (EP);
C23C14/04 (EP);
C23C16/01 (EP);
C23C16/04 (EP);
C25D1/003 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG VON TEILCHEN IN EINEM FLUID | [2009/52] | English: | MECHANICAL PROCESS FOR CREATING PARTICLES IN A FLUID | [2009/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ MÉCANIQUE POUR CRÉER DES PARTICULES DANS UN LIQUIDE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 09.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HERNANDEZ C J ET AL, "Colloidal alphabet soup: monodisperse dispersions of shape-designed lithoparticles", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, American Chemical Society (ACS) [US], (20070213), vol. 111, no. 12, doi:10.1021/jp0672095, ISSN 1932-7447, pages 4477 - 4480, XP002654297 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp0672095 | [A] - MIKRAJUDDIN ET AL, "Single route for producing organized metallic domes, dots, and pores by colloidal templating and over-sputtering", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY-VCH VERLAG [DE], (20020617), vol. 14, no. 12, doi:10.1002/1521-4095(20020618)14:12<930::AID-ADMA930>3.0.CO;2-L, pages 930 - 933, XP001130546 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4095(20020618)14:12<930::AID-ADMA930>3.0.CO;2-L | International search | [Y]US2005274833 (YADAV TAPESH [US], et al); | [Y]US2007031505 (ROY KRISHNENDU [US], et al); | [Y]US6670427 (ULBRICHT MATHIAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2007048383 (HELMUS MICHAEL N [US]); | [A]US2005260503 (LIN WEI-LIAN [TW], et al); | [A]US2006275196 (ALEXANDRIDIS PASCHALIS [US], et al); | [AP]US2008050564 (FUJIKAWA SHIGENORI [JP], et al) | Examination | WO9929498 | - XIA Y ET AL, "Soft Lithography", ANNUAL REVIEW OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, Annual Reviews Inc., Palo Alto, CA [US], (199808), vol. 28, doi:10.1146/ANNUREV.MATSCI.28.1.153, ISSN 0084-6600, pages 153 - 184, XP009023786 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.matsci.28.1.153 | by applicant | US2005274833 | US2007031505 | - ROLLAND, J.P.; MAYNOR, B.W.; EULISS, L.E.; EXNER, A.E.; DENISON, G.M.; DESIMONE, J.M., "Direct fabrication of monodisperse shape-specific nanobiomaterials through imprinting exists", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 10096 - 10100 |