EP2156632 - DETERMINING A CHANNEL MATRIX BY MEASURING INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA, Incorporated 600- 700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMER, Gerhard Guenter, Theodor 41b Hillside Avenue Chatham, NJ 07928 / US | 02 /
WHITING, Philip, Alfred 174 Union Avenue New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | 03 /
ZIVKOVIC, Miroslav Leplaan 43a's-gravenhage NL-2565 LD The Hague / NL | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Nokia Bell Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | ALU Antw Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2010/08] | BiiP cvba Gaston Crommenlaan 10 b101 9050 Ledeberg (Ghent) / BE | Application number, filing date | 08727240.7 | 01.04.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008US04232 | Priority number, date | US20070922703P | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 922703 P | US20070897877 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: US 897877 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008123977 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2156632 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2156632 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L25/03, H04L25/02 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L25/03 (KR);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04B17/345 (EP,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04B7/0632 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0224 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04M3/34 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG EINER KANALMATRIX DURCH STÖRUNGSMESSUNG | [2010/08] | English: | DETERMINING A CHANNEL MATRIX BY MEASURING INTERFERENCE | [2010/08] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'UNE MATRICE DE CANAL PAR MESURE DE L'INTERFÉRENCE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 01.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11171128.9 / EP2385672 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2008 | AT | 03.08.2011 | BE | 03.08.2011 | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HR | 03.08.2011 | LT | 03.08.2011 | LV | 03.08.2011 | MT | 03.08.2011 | NL | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | TR | 03.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | NO | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | IS | 03.12.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | IE | 01.04.2012 | LU | 01.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2012 | ||
LU | 01.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 01.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HR | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NO | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003210750 (ONGGOSANUSI EKO N [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0041] *; | [A] - KIHONG KIM ET AL, "Interference Mitigation in MIMO Systems by Subset Antenna Transmission", WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20060809), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 1572-834X, pages 305 - 315, XP019468831 [A] 1-10 * page 305 - page 307 * | [A] - CENDRILLON R ET AL, "Partial crosstalk precompensation in downstream VDSL", SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041101), vol. 84, no. 11, ISSN 0165-1684, pages 2005 - 2019, XP004591296 [A] 1,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sigpro.2004.07.013 | [A] - WEBB M ET AL, "Matrix structure and capacity bounds of MIMO channels in interference", IEE PROCEEDINGS : COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, GB, (20060803), vol. 153, no. 4, ISSN 1350-2425, pages 476 - 481, XP006026764 [A] 1,6 * the whole document * | [A] - PALOMAR D P ET AL, "Optimum joint transmit-receive linear processing for vectored DSL transmission with QoS requirements", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 36TH. ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, & COMPUTERS. PACIFIC GROOVE, CA, NOV. 3 - 6, 2002; [ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021103), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7576-5, pages 388 - 392, XP010638237 [A] 1,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2002.1197212 |