EP2109843 - INTELLIGENT SYSTEM FOR MANAGING VEHICULAR TRAFFIC FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mergex Traffic Systems Company, Dba The Mergex Group 3407 Pleasant Vale Drive Carlsbad, California 92010 / US | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILIMORIA, Yaz 3407 Pleasant Vale Drive Carlsbad, California 92010 / US | 02 /
GOMES, Gabriel 1134 Blake Street Berkeley, California 94702 / US | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08728027.7 | 22.01.2008 | [2009/43] | WO2008US51619 | Priority number, date | US20070881608P | 22.01.2007 Original published format: US 881608 P | US20070627933 | 26.01.2007 Original published format: US 627933 | US20070676300 | 18.02.2007 Original published format: US 676300 | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008091843 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2109843 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/76 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
G08G1/095 (EP,US);
G08G1/08 (EP,US);
G08G1/164 (EP,US);
G08G1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES FAHRZEUGVERKEHRSFLUSSES | [2009/43] | English: | INTELLIGENT SYSTEM FOR MANAGING VEHICULAR TRAFFIC FLOW | [2009/43] | French: | SYSTEME INTELLIGENT DE GESTION DE FLUX DE CIRCULATION DE VEHICULES | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 06.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE10330989 (SPIEGELMACHER KURT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,12 * Parahraphs [0011], [0019], [0020], [0022], [0025], [0027]-[0037];; figures 1-3 * [I] 6-11,14; | [X]US3593262 (SPENCER ROLF EDMUND) [X] 1,2,9,12 * column 1, line 4 - line 13 * * column 1, line 46 - line 69 * * column 2, line 22 - line 26 * * column 2, line 34 - line 58 * * column 3, line 28 - line 35 * * column 3, line 48 - line 56 *; | [A]US3529284 (VILLEMAIN CHARLES AUGUSTE) [A] 1,15 * column 1, line 48 - line 59 * * column 5, line 7 - line 38 * | International search | [X]US2006235597 (HORI KOJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2002049118 (VORNEHM MARTIN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2005015203 (NISHIRA HIKARU [JP]); | [Y]US2005278098 (BREED DAVID S [US]); | [Y]US2005187701 (BANEY DOUGLAS M [US]); | [A]US2005179527 (SCHOFIELD KENNETH [US]) |