EP2120570 - TREATMENT OF COMORBID PREMATURE EJACULATION AND ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DMI Biosciences, Inc. The Quadrant 5445 DTC Parkway, Suite 925 Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states DMI Biosciences, Inc. 8400 East Crescent Parkway Suite 600 Greenwood Village CO 80111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKLER, James, V. 800 Washington Street 909 Denver, CO 80203 / US | 02 /
BILYARD, Kevin 22 Broad Walk Wilmslow Cheshire SK9 5PL / GB | 03 /
BAR-OR, David 900 E. Oxford Lane Englewood, CO 80110 / US | [2012/20] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
WINKLER, James, V. 800 Washington Street 909 Denver, CO 80203 / US | ||
02 /
BILYARD, Kevin 22 Broad Walk Wilmslow Cheshire SK9 5PL / GB | |||
03 /
BAR-OR, David 900 E. Oxford Lane Englewood, CO 80110 / US | Representative(s) | Thomas, Simon Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | [2012/20] |
Former [2009/48] | Thomas, Simon Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 08729644.8 | 12.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US53710 | Priority number, date | US20070889369P | 12.02.2007 Original published format: US 889369 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008100926 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120570 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120570 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A01N43/32, A61K31/137, A61K31/4985, A61K31/519, A61K31/53, A61P15/10 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (KR);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4985, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2009/48] | A01N43/32, A61K31/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | 02.09.2009 | BA | 02.09.2009 | MK | 02.09.2009 | RS | 02.09.2009 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG FRÜHZEITIGER COMORBID-EJAKULATION UND EREKTILER DYSFUNKTION | [2009/48] | English: | TREATMENT OF COMORBID PREMATURE EJACULATION AND ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION | [2009/48] | French: | TRAITEMENT DESTINÉ À UNE ÉJACULATION PRÉCOCE ET AUX TROUBLES DE L'ÉRECTION COMORBIDES | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 21.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12167624.1 / EP2486927 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2010 | 28.02.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2008 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | HR | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | IE | 12.02.2013 | LU | 12.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/32] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 12.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO2007070779 (AZAYA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-19 * examples 2,5 *; | [EL]WO2008100933 (DMI BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [EL] 1-19 * claim 19 *; | [E]WO2008131256 (TRINITY LAB INC [US], et al) [E] 1-19* example 4; claims 1,13,19 * | International search | [Y]US6403597 (WILSON LELAND F [US], et al); | [Y]US6974839 (BAR-OR DAVID [US]) | Examination | WO2004069167 | - Statement from Dr Christopher P. Steidle | - Declaraton from inventors filed in proceedings before US Patent and Trademark Office | by applicant | US5151448 | WO9640054 | US6037360 | - MONTAGUE ET AL., J. UROL., (2004), vol. 172, pages 290 - 294 | - Male Infertility and Sexual Dysfunction, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1997), page 356 |