EP2114312 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE OF AN IMPLANT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/46] | IMPLANT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE | ||
[2013/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConforMIS, Inc. 28 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2013/50] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states ConforMIS, Inc. 11 North Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Conformis, Inc. 11 North Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | ||
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Conformis, Inc. 2 Fourth Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Philipp 7 Fair Oaks Terrace Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Nikolaistrasse 15 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/46] | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Nikolaistrasse 15 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08729875.8 | 14.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008US53977 | Priority number, date | US20070889859P | 14.02.2007 Original published format: US 889859 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008101090 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2114312 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2114312 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38, A61F2/30 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
A61F2/30756 (EP,US);
B23P19/04 (US);
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61F2/38 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (US);
A61F2/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/3804 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2/40 (EP,US);
A61F2/4202 (EP,US);
A61F2/4225 (EP,US);
A61F2/4241 (EP,US);
A61F2/4261 (EP,US);
A61F2/44 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30892 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30952 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30957 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30968 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3097 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0014 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00011 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00029 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00131 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00161 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00167 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00179 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00203 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00239 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN IMPLANTAT | [2013/24] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE OF AN IMPLANT DEVICE | [2013/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'IMPLANT | [2013/24] |
Former [2009/46] | IMPLANTAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2009/46] | IMPLANT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE | ||
Former [2009/46] | DISPOSITIF D'IMPLANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 02.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12192903.8 / EP2591756 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2008 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BE | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | IE | 14.02.2014 | LU | 14.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | FR | 10.03.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.02.2008 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
FR | 10.03.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4673409 (VAN KAMPEN CRAIG L [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 15 - line 21; figures 1,8 *; | [X]DE3933459 (REUMANN KARSTEN DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [X]US5246530 (BUGLE CLIFFORD M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 24 - line 49; figures 3,7,11,12 *; | [X]DE10055465 (BLZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 11-23 * paragraph [0028] *; | [X]WO2004047688 (JURIDICAL FOUNDATION OSAKA IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]EP1683593 (HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP [US]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0023] , [0104] *; | [PX]US2008004709 (O'NEILL WILLIAM [GB], et al) [PX] 11-23 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] *; | [E]DE102006037067 (METOXIT AG [CH]) [E] 11-23* the whole document * |