EP2122446 - COMPUTER SYSTEM EVENTS INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDRIKHOVSKI, Serguei c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
ELRIF, Paul M. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SNOVER, Jeffrey P. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08730037.2 | 15.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US54157 | Priority number, date | US20070707600 | 15.02.2007 Original published format: US 707600 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008101207 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2122446 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F17/00, // G06F11/32 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
G06F9/542 (US);
G06F11/324 (EP,US);
G06F11/328 (US);
Y10S715/963 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | G06F3/048, G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR COMPUTERSYSTEMEREIGNISSE | [2009/48] | English: | COMPUTER SYSTEM EVENTS INTERFACE | [2009/48] | French: | INTERFACE D'ÉVÉNEMENTS SYSTÈME D'ORDINATEUR | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 31.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.04.2019 | 22.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/32] | 01.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 09.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005097471 (FARADAY PETER [US], et al) [A] 1,10,14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0009] , [0059] , [0060] *; | [I]US2005262233 (ALON ROEE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0085] , [0086] * | International search | [A]US5893128 (NAUCKHOFF SVEN [SE]); | [A]US6006193 (GIBSON KENNETH U [US], et al); | [A]US6341279 (NYE JEFF [US]); | [A]US6526405 (MANNILA HEIKKI O [FI], et al) | by applicant | US2005262233 |