EP2112928 - SYNTHESIS OF NOVEL XYLOSIDES AND POTENTIAL USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALAGURUNATHAN, Kuberan 1321 Medical Plaza Salt Lake City, UT 84112 / US | 02 /
ETHIRAJAN, Manivannan 4139 Wildwood Drive Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | 03 /
VICTOR, Xylophone, V. 1150 Garfield Avenue 11 Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | 04 /
TRAN, Vy, My 215 Medical Plaza Salt Lake City, UT 84112 / US | 05 /
NGUYEN, Khiem 1026 Medical Plaza Salt Lake City, UT 84112 / US | [2010/12] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
BALAGURUNATHAN, Kuberan 1311 Medical Plaza Salt Lake City, UT 84112 / US | ||
02 /
ETHIRAJAN, Manivannan 4139 Wildwood Drive Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | |||
03 /
VICTOR, Xylophone, V. 1150 Garfield Avenue 11 Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | |||
04 /
TRAN, Vy, My 215 Medical Plaza Salt Lake City, UT 84112 / US | |||
05 /
NGUYEN, Khiem 1026 Medical Plaza Salt Lake City, UT 84112 / US | Representative(s) | Leaman, Keith, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Leaman, Keith, et al Leaman Browne Limited 5 South Parade Leeds LS1 5QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08730056.2 | 15.02.2008 | [2009/45] | WO2008US54176 | Priority number, date | US20070891168P | 22.02.2007 Original published format: US 891168 P | US20070896230P | 21.03.2007 Original published format: US 896230 P | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008103618 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2112928 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, C07H1/00, C07H19/056 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
C07H1/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
C07H19/056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON NEUARTIGEN XYLOSIDEN UND IHRE MÖGLICHE VERWENDUNG | [2009/45] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF NOVEL XYLOSIDES AND POTENTIAL USES THEREOF | [2009/45] | French: | SYNTHÈSE DE NOUVEAUX XYLOSIDES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS POTENTIELLES | [2009/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 19.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005012326 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 92; compound 35 *; | [X] - FAZIO FABIO ET AL, "Synthesis of Sugar Arrays in Microtiter Plate", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, ACS PUBLICATIONS, US, (20020101), vol. 124, no. 48, doi:10.1021/JA020887U, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 14397 - 14402, XP002412755 [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * compounds 5, 6, 11, 15, 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja020887u | [X] - M. T. GARCÍAA-LÓAPEZ ET AL, "Heterocyclic N -glycosides. III. Synthesis of N -glycosyl- v -triazoles from glycosyl azides and phenylacetylene", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (19691001), vol. 6, no. 5, doi:10.1002/jhet.5570060508, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 639 - 642, XP055090603 [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 641 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570060508 | International search | [A]US6495147 (DUMAS MARC [FR], et al); | [A]US2005070001 (KLESSIEK KNUT [DE], et al); | [X] - SOBUE ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1987), vol. 241, no. 2, pages 591 - 601, XP008115298 | [X] - GORDON ET AL., "Extracellular matrix proteoglycans and cell-substratum adhesion of human endothelial cells: the effect of beta-D-xylopyranoside", CAPLUS, Database accession no. (1986:495189), XP008111826 | [ ] - CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 151, pages 121 - 134 |