EP2125096 - MODULAR COMBINATION OF MEDICATION INFUSION AND ANALYTE MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSS, Udo 5172 Stone Canyon Drive Castro Valley, CA 94522 / US | 02 /
STAFFORD, Gary A. 962 Hotel Avenue Hayward California 94541 / US | [2012/17] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
HOSS, Udo 5172 Stone Canyon Drive Castro Valley, CA 94522 / US | ||
02 /
TALL, Susan, C. 2308 Hastings Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
03 /
STAFFORD, Gary, A. 962 Hotel Avenue Hayward, CA 94541 / US | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08730066.1 | 16.02.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US54186 | Priority number, date | US20070890497P | 19.02.2007 Original published format: US 890497 P | US20080032593 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: US 32593 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008103620 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2125096 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1726 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | MODULARE KOMBINATION AUS ARZNEIMITTELINFUSION UND ANALYTÜBERWACHUNG | [2009/49] | English: | MODULAR COMBINATION OF MEDICATION INFUSION AND ANALYTE MONITORING | [2009/49] | French: | COMBINAISON MODULAIRE DE PERFUSION DE MÉDICAMENT ET DE SURVEILLANCE D'ANALYTE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 12.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/01] | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006121921 (MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC [US]; MOBERG SHELDON B [US]; HANSON IAN [US]; CH) [X] 1-9,15,16 * paragraphs [0033] - [0045] * | International search | [XY]US6175752 (SAY et al.) [X] 1, 2, 7-11, and 13-30 * col. 2, In 12 - col. 3, In 5; col. 5, In 25-37; col. 6, In 52 - col. 7. In 11; col. 7, In 14-29; col. 12, In 22-36; col. 14, In 58-60; col. 24, In 48-55; col. 30, In 64-col. 31, In 40; col. 41, In 66 - col. 42, In 8; col. 51, In 66 - col, 52, In 8; col. 54, In 46-61 * [Y] 3-6 and 12; | [A]US6514689 (HAN et al.) [A] 1, 23, and 26 * entire document *; | [A]US6560471 (HELLER et al.) [A] 1, 23, and 26 * entire document *; | [P]US7291497 (HOLMES et al.) [P] 1, 23, and 26 * entire document *; | [P]US7267665 (STE IL et al.) [P] 1, 23, and 26 * entire document * |