EP2125026 - BRIDGED POLYCYCLIC COMPOUND BASED COMPOSITIONS FOR THE INHIBITION AND AMELIORATION OF DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AllAccem, Inc. 1300 Industrial Road, Suite 16 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [2013/52] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Allaccem, Inc. Menlo Business Park 1455 Adams Drive, Suite 1180 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITEFORD, Jeffery A. 1300 Industrial Road, Suite 16 San Carlos, California 94070 / US | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
WHITEFORD, Jeffery A. 1908 Valdez Avenue Belmont, California 94002 / US | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2014/39] |
Former [2009/49] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08730417.6 | 21.02.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008US54611 | Priority number, date | US20070902577P | 21.02.2007 Original published format: US 902577 P | US20070964312P | 10.08.2007 Original published format: US 964312 P | US20070965154P | 17.08.2007 Original published format: US 965154 P | US20080029332 | 16.02.2008 Original published format: US 29332 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008103847 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2125026 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2125026 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/6949 (EP,US);
A61K47/547 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF VERBRÜCKTER POLYCYCLISCHER VERBINDUNG BASIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG UND LINDERUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN | [2009/49] | English: | BRIDGED POLYCYCLIC COMPOUND BASED COMPOSITIONS FOR THE INHIBITION AND AMELIORATION OF DISEASE | [2009/49] | French: | COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE COMPOSÉS POLYCYCLIQUES PONTÉS POUR L'INHIBITION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 02.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2008 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | HR | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | LU | 21.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 21.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [PXL]WO2007070801 (ALLACCEM INC [US], et al) [PXL] 1-24,29-104 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2007202342 (WHITEFORD JEFFERY A [US], et al) [PX] 1-24,29-104 * the whole document *; | [A] - ZHUANG X-M ET AL, "Cyanide and imidazolate bridged macrocyclic dinuclear CuII complexes: Synthesis, structure and magnetic properties", INORGANICA CHIMICA ACTA, X, XX, (20050330), vol. 358, no. 6, ISSN 0020-1693, pages 2129 - 2134, XP004777639 [A] 1 * Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ica.2004.12.044 | [A] - PIERRE J L ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF A NOVEL MACROBICYCLIC CAVITY POSSESSING SIX CONVERGENT HYDROXYL GROUPS AND ACTING AS A SIDEROPHORE", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION IN ENGLISH, (1991), vol. 30, no. 1, ISSN 0570-0833, pages 85 - 86, XP002497022 [A] 1-104 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.199100851 | [A] - SHIN C -G ET AL, "Novel synthesis of the main central 2,3,6-trisubstituted pyridine skeleton [Fragment A-B-C] of a macrobicyclic antibiotic, cyclothiazomycin", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN 200207 JP, (200207), vol. 75, no. 7, ISSN 0009-2673, pages 1583 - 1596, XP002497023 [A] 1-104 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.75.1583 | by applicant | GB599722 | US2455807 | US3066112 | US3179623 | US3194784 | US3751399 | US3926906 | US4544359 | US4547531 | US4666896 | US5145853 | US5276068 | US5348988 | US5393516 | US5496545 | US5534565 | US5597560 | US5667775 | US5753268 | US5753269 | US5948390 | US5990110 | US2001009931 | US6326417 | US6440405 | US6500004 | US6562329 | US6593395 | US2003134933 | US6756364 | US2004267009 | US6858203 | US6908609 | US2005158252 | US2005252413 | - ZHUANG, X.-M. ET AL., "Cyanide and imidazolate bridged macrocyclic dinuclear Cull complexes: Synthesis, structure and magnetic properties", INORGANICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2005), vol. 358, pages 2129 - 2134 | - PIERRE, J. L. ET AL., "Synthesis of a Novel Macrobicyclic Cavity Possessing Six Convergent Hydroxyl Groups and Acting as a Siderophore", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1991), vol. 30, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1002/anie.199100851, pages 85 - 86, XP002497022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.199100851 | - DENG-JYE YANG; LUCY SUN HWANG, JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2006), vol. 1119, pages 277 - 284 | - MARCIL, V., J. NUTR., (2003), vol. 133, pages 2180 - 2183 | - HUSSAIN, M. M., JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 44, pages 22 - 32 | - PERNAK ET AL., "Synthesis and anti-microbial activities of some pyridinium salts with alkoxymethyl hydrophobic group", EUR. J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 36, doi:doi:10.1016/S0223-5234(01)80005-2, pages 899 - 907, XP004400910 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(01)80005-2 | - T. LOFTSSON, J. MED. CHEM., (2003), vol. 46, pages 4173 - 4181 | - S.L. COOPER, "Recent Advances in Antimicrobial Dendrimers", ADV. MATER., (2000), vol. 12, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1521-4095(200006)12:11<843::AID-ADMA843>3.0.CO;2-T, pages 843 - 846, XP000963567 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4095(200006)12:11<843::AID-ADMA843>3.0.CO;2-T | - S.L. COOPER, BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2000), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 473 - 480 | - A.M. KLIBANOV, BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (2003), vol. 25, pages 1661 - 1665 | - CHAND ET AL., "Synthesis of a Heteroditopic Cryptand Capable of Imposing a Distorted Coordination Geometry onto Cu(II): Crystal Structures of the Cryptand (L), [Cu(L)(CN)](picrate), and [Cu(L)(NCS)] {picrate) and Spectroscopic Studies of the Cu(II) Complexes", INORG CHEM, (1996), vol. 35, pages 3380 - 3387 | - "27 and 28", BERTRAM G. KATZUNG,, REMINGTON'S PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, 8th Edition, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1990), vol. 28, pages 484 - 528 | - J.M SLACK, J. DENT. RES, (1971), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 78 - 82 | - J. CHEM. SOC., (1946), pages 729 - 737 | - J. CHEM. SOC, (1948), pages 1630 - 1636 | US20060638327 |