EP2134183 - AUTOMATED PIZZA PREPARATION AND VENDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K&G Enterprises, Llc 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHATCHADOURIAN, Puzant 100 United Nations Plaza 327 East 48th Street New York, NY 10017 / US | 02 /
KOUYOUMDJIAN, Krikor c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 03 /
BRINI, Bernardo c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 04 /
PAPAKHIAN, Daniel c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 05 /
SCURTU, Dragosh c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 06 /
KAZARIAN, Aram c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 07 /
CARBONE, Philip c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 08 /
PESCATORE, Peter c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 09 /
BREKKEN, Matthew c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 10 /
KING, Darrell c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 11 /
MCKENNEY, Kyle c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | 12 /
ELLIS, Warren c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | [2014/15] |
Former [2010/08] | 01 /
KHATCHADOURIAN, Puzant 100 United Nations Plaza 327 East 48th Street New York, NY 10017 / US | ||
02 /
KOUYOUMDJIAN, Krikor c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
03 /
BRINI, Bernardo c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
04 /
PAPAKHIAN, Daniel c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
05 /
SCURTU, Dragosh c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
06 /
KAZARIAN, Aram c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
07 /
CARBONE, Philip c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
08 /
PESCATORE, Peter c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
09 /
BREKKEN, Matthew c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
10 /
KING, Darrell c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
11 /
MCKENNEY, Kyle c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
12 /
ELLIS, Warren c/o K&G Enterprises, LLC 307 West 36th Street 7th Floor New York, NY 10018 / US | |||
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
KHATCHADOURIAN, Puzant 100 United Nations Plaza 327 East 48th Street New York, NY 10017 / US | ||
02 /
KOUYOUMDJIAN, Krikor Montreal, QC / CA | |||
03 /
BRINI, Bernardo Montreal, QC / CA | |||
04 /
PAPAKHIAN, Daniel Montreal, QC / CA | |||
05 /
SCURTU, Dragosh Montreal, Quebec / CA | |||
06 /
KAZARIAN, Aram Montreal, Quebec / CA | |||
07 /
CARBONE, Philip Cambridge, MA / US | |||
08 /
PESCATORE, Peter Cambridge, MA / US | |||
09 /
BREKKEN, Matthew Cambridge, MA / US | |||
10 /
KING, Darrell Cambridge, MA / US | |||
11 /
MCKENNEY, Kyle Cambridge, MA / US | |||
12 /
ELLIS, Warren Cambridge, MA / US | Representative(s) | Lucas, Laurent Jacques, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2014/15] |
Former [2009/52] | Lucas, Laurent Jacques, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08730514.0 | 22.02.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008US54723 | Priority number, date | US20070891218P | 22.02.2007 Original published format: US 891218 P | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008103907 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134183 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134183 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/02, A21C11/00, A21D13/00 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
A21C11/006 (EP,US);
A21D8/02 (KR);
A21D13/41 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | A21D8/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES PIZZAZUBEREITUNGS- UND VERKAUFSYSTEM | [2013/43] | English: | AUTOMATED PIZZA PREPARATION AND VENDING SYSTEM | [2009/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉPARATION ET DE DISTRIBUTION AUTOMATIQUES DE PIZZA | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/52] | AUTOMATISIERTES PIZZAZUBEREITUNGS- UND VERKAUFFSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 01.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2009 | Decision despatched | 23.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 23.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 23.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 23.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 23.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2008 | AT | 09.04.2014 | BE | 09.04.2014 | CY | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | HR | 09.04.2014 | LT | 09.04.2014 | LV | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | MT | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | NO | 09.07.2014 | IS | 09.08.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3273300 (WATROUS HOWARD N, et al) [Y] 26-28* the whole document *; | [IY]US5921170 (KHATCHADOURIAN PUZANT [US], et al) [I] 1,19-21 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 26-28; | [IY]US2001024671 (PILATI MARCO [IT], et al) [I] 1,19-21 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 26-28; | [I]US2002176921 (TORGHELE CLAUDIO [CH], et al) [I] 1,19-21,26-28 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US3273300 (WATROUS HOWARD N, et al); | [Y]US4252055 (JOHANSSON LEIF A T, et al); | [Y]US4737092 (BULLICK NICK A [US]); | [Y]US5121677 (LE CLAIRE HARRY E [US], et al); | [X]US5921170 (KHATCHADOURIAN PUZANT [US], et al); | [Y]US5997924 (OLANDER JR WILLIAM T [US], et al); | [Y]US2002088206 (GENDRE PATRICK [FR], et al); | [Y]US6546847 (PILATI MARCO [IT], et al) |