EP2134204 - INTERCHANGEABLE COMPONENT SHOE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stefani, Jerry 18611 Mesa Drive Villa Park, CA 92861 / US | [2015/33] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Stefani, Jerry 18611 Mesa Drive Villa Park, CA 92861 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Instone, Alicia Claire Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Instone, Alicia Claire Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08731727.7 | 07.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008US56283 | Priority number, date | US20070694880 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: US 694880 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008121495 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134204 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134204 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/24 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A43B3/24 (EP,US);
A43B3/244 (EP,US);
A43B3/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2009/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHUHSYSTEM MIT AUSTAUSCHBAREN KOMPONENTEN | [2009/52] | English: | INTERCHANGEABLE COMPONENT SHOE SYSTEM | [2009/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHAUSSURE À ÉLÉMENTS INTERCHANGEABLES | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14179818.1 / EP2801274 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.08.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2008 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BE | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | HR | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | NO | 12.11.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | IE | 07.03.2016 | LU | 07.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.03.2008 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.03.2008 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 07.03.2016 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 07.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB874066 (IGNATZ FOLKMANN) [X] 1-11,16 * page 1, line 70 - page 2, line 10; figure - *; | [X]US4745693 (BROWN RANDY N [US]) [X] 1-3,7-15 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 16; figure - *; | [X]DE4412154 (HARTUNG PETER [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 48 - line 60; figure - * | Examination | WO9526653 |