EP2142341 - EXHAUST CHECK VALVE AND PISTON RETURN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Joseph, S. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/02] | Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08732747.4 | 24.03.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008US57983 | Priority number, date | US20070896957P | 26.03.2007 Original published format: US 896957 P | US20080073139 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: US 73139 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008118838 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2142341 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2142341 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/08, F02B63/02, F02B71/04 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
B25C1/08 (EP,US);
F01L21/00 (EP,US);
F01L3/20 (EP,US);
F01L9/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | AUSLASSRÜCKSCHLAGVENTIL UND KOLBENRÜCKSTELLSYSTEM | [2010/02] | English: | EXHAUST CHECK VALVE AND PISTON RETURN SYSTEM | [2010/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RETOUR DE PISTON ET DE SOUPAPE DE SÛRETÉ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.05.2011 | 16.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2008 | AT | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | IE | 24.03.2012 | LU | 24.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 24.03.2012 | ||
LU | 24.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 24.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 24.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 24.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 24.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4665868 (ADAMS JOSEPH S [CA]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 4 - line 10 *; | [X]US6116489 (BRANSTON PAUL GORDON [CA]) [X] 1* column 6, line 56 - line 65 *; | [X]US2001006045 (THIELEKE JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0047] *; | [X]US2006065219 (HERTLEIN PETER [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0027]; figure 4 * |