EP2134380 - MEDICAL DEVICES HAVING BIOERODABLE LAYERS FOR THE RELEASE OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIKES, Courtney 3825 Symes Drive Bellemead, New Jersey 08502 / US | 02 /
STECKEL, Mark 7 Ridge Road Sharon, MA 02067 / US | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
SIKES, Courtney 98 Carrington Lane Uxbridge, MA 01569 / US | ||
02 /
STECKEL, Mark 7 Ridge Road Sharon, MA 02067 / US | Representative(s) | Hermann, Gerhard Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Hermann, Gerhard Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08732921.5 | 27.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008US58407 | Priority number, date | US20070920394P | 28.03.2007 Original published format: US 920394 P | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008121702 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2134380 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/54, A61L31/16, A61L27/34, A61L31/10 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L2300/604 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L31/10, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN MIT BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBAREN SCHICHTEN ZUR FREISETZUNG VON THERAPEUTIKA | [2009/52] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICES HAVING BIOERODABLE LAYERS FOR THE RELEASE OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2009/52] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX AYANT DES COUCHES BIOÉRODABLES POUR LA LIBÉRATION D'AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 01.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/28] | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO9856312 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [I] 1-24 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 23 * * page 7, line 5 - line 17 * * page 8, line 11 - line 23 * * claims 1-15 *; | [XI]EP1639962 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-11,13-24 * page 3, paragraph 10 - paragraph 15 * * page 4, paragraph 21 - paragraph 22 * * page 7, paragraph 30 - paragraph 31 * * page 8, paragraph 38 - paragraph 40 * * page 9, paragraph 45 - paragraph 47 * * examples 1-3 * [I] 12; | [XI]WO2006080630 (HANDOK PHARMACEUTICALS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9-11,13-14,18-19,21-22,24 * page 7, line 3 - line 12 * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 3 * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 23 * * page 13, line 19 - line 22 * * example 1 * [I] 5,7-8,12,15-17,20,23; | [X]US2006246108 (PACETTI STEPHEN D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,13,15-24 * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 1, paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 12 * * page 3, paragraph 21 - paragraph 35 * * page 5, paragraph 43 - paragraph 44 * * claims 1-28 *; | [E]WO2009036253 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [E] 1-3,6,9-11,13-19,21-24 * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 26, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 14 - page 3, paragraph 17 * * page 4, paragraph 19 * * page 7, paragraph 26 * * page 14, paragraph 46 ** examples 1,3 * | Examination | WO2006002365 | WO2007012979 |