Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010523769 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73224307 | 03.04.2007 | WO2008US59087 | 02.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2139966 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2016 | B1 | EP2139966 | 06.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73224307 | 03.04.2007 | WO2008US59087 | 02.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101688096 | 31.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73224307 | 03.04.2007 | WO2008US59087 | 02.04.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008122028 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73224307 | 03.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008249233 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73224307 | 03.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100016005 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US73224307 | 03.04.2007 |