EP2164364 - DRIVE FOR A MOVABLE FURNITURE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTLE, Klaus Dorf 15a 6842 Koblach / AT | [2012/16] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
MATTLE, Klaus Dorf 15a A-6842 Koblach / AT | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Stephan, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Hofinger, Stephan, et al Postfach 332 6010 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 08733255.7 | 25.04.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008AT00152 | Priority number, date | AT20070000695 | 07.05.2007 Original published format: AT 6952007 | [2010/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134785 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2164364 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2164364 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A47B88/457 (EP,US);
E05D15/262 (EP,US);
E05F15/41 (EP,US);
E05F15/611 (EP,US);
E05F15/63 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/234 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/236 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/716 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/3013 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/326 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/56 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/458 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/232 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/238 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | ANTRIEB FÜR EIN BEWEGBARES MÖBELTEIL | [2010/12] | English: | DRIVE FOR A MOVABLE FURNITURE ELEMENT | [2010/12] | French: | MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UNE PARTIE MOBILE DE MEUBLE | [2012/16] |
Former [2010/12] | MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR PARTIE MOBILE DE MEUBLE | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | HR | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MC | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | NO | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/01] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | |
NO | 27.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2006017864 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT], et al) [XD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE202007006884U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [PA] 1-10* paragraph [0015] *; | [PX]DE202006006190U (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [PX] 1-10 * paragraph [0035] *; | [PA]WO2007098515 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT], et al) [PA] 1-10 * page 2, line 7 - line 29; claims 2-4 * | by applicant | WO2006017864 | WO2006099645 |