EP2149077 - TRACEABILITY SYSTEM APPLIED TO FARM PRODUCTION ACTIVITIES, INDUSTRIALIZATION AND COMMERCIALIZATION OF BEE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidade Federal De Lavras Campus Universitário Caixa Postal 3037 Lavras 37200-000 Minas Gerais / BR | For all designated states Fundacao De Amparo A Pesquisa Do Estado De Minas Gerais - Fapemig Rua Raul Pompeia nº 101 Bairro São pedro Belo Horizonte 30330-080 Minas Garais / BR | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VICTORIO, Ricardo Alexandre da Silva Shimabukuro Rua Prof. Alcino de Almeida Maudonnet nº 32 Jd. N.Sra. Auxiliadora Campinas 13075-470 São Paulo / BR | 02 /
VARGAS, Gustavo Vilela Rua Dr. Quirino n° 341 apt. 83 Bosque Campinas 13026-064 São Paulo / BR | 03 /
CHUFI, Fernando Augusto Rua Pascoal Picelli nº 97 apt.15 Barão Geraldo Campinas 13084-145 São Paulo / BR | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Thiago Yoshihiro Ito Av. Pres. Kennedy nº 583 Cidade Nova Indaiatuba 13334-170 São Paulo / BR | 05 /
SAN JUAN, Fábio Rua Eça de Queiroz nº 2459 casa 3 Vila Monteiro Piracicaba 13418-530 São Paulo / BR | 06 /
PATACA, Caluã de Lacerda Rua Dirce Gianese Barbiere nº 109 Vila São João Campinas 13084-568 São Paulo / BR | 07 /
BOMFIM, José Luis Ponciano Rua Dirce Gianese Barbiere nº 109 Vila São João Campinas 13084-568 São Paulo / BR | 08 /
RAMOS, Adriana Rua Maria Aparecida Carlos Marques nº 51 Jd. Sta. Genebra II Campinas 13084-761 São Paulo / BR | 09 /
FELICIANO, Guilherme de Oliveira Rua Com. Shotaro Kiyokawa nº 112 Chácara Jafet Mogi das Cruzes 08730-820 São Paulo / BR | 10 /
RIBEIRO, Maria Cristina Marcucci Rua Espírito Santo nº 504 São Bernardo Campinas 13031-180 São Paulo / BR | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/05] | Murray, Elisabeth Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08733515.4 | 18.04.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008BR00112 | Priority number, date | BR2007PI01450 | 18.04.2007 Original published format: BR PI0701450 | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008128310 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2149077 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06Q50/00 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | VERFOLGBARKEITSSYSTEM, ANGEWANDT AUF FARMPRODUKTIONSAKTIVITÄTEN, INDUSTRIALISIERUNG UND KOMMERZIALISIERUNG VON BIENENPRODUKTEN | [2010/05] | English: | TRACEABILITY SYSTEM APPLIED TO FARM PRODUCTION ACTIVITIES, INDUSTRIALIZATION AND COMMERCIALIZATION OF BEE PRODUCTS | [2010/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAÇABILITÉ APPLIQUÉ À DES ACTIVITÉS DE PRODUCTION AGRICOLE, D'INDUSTRIALISATION ET DE COMMERCIALISATION DE PRODUITS APICOLES | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 12.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5587577 (SCHULTZ DARALD R [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 5 - column 8 *; | [X]WO9727527 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 7 - page 21 *; | [A]US6023147 (CARGIN JR KEITH K [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 17 - column 23 *; | [X]EP1383029 (VOCOLLECT INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2 - column 10 *; | [X]US2005075145 (DVORAK JOSEPH L [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0016] *; | [A]US2006106539 (CHOATE PAUL H [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0158] *; | [A]US2006122794 (SPRAGUE MICHAEL C [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0174] *; | [A]US2006187048 (CURKENDALL LELAND D [US], et al) [A] 1,2* paragraph [0304] - paragraph [0305]; figure 37 *; | [A]US2006271555 (BECK ANDY D [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0052] * | by applicant | WO9727527 | US2005075145 |