EP2145162 - SCALE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carag AG Bahnhofstrasse 9 6340 Baar / CH | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANNHART, Jevgenij St.jakobstrasse 40 CH-6330 Cham / CH | 02 /
RÖTHLIN, Cyrill Dorfgässli 8 CH-6331 Hünenberg / CH | 03 /
ROBERT, Marc Siegwartstrasse 6 CH-6403 Küssnacht / CH | 04 /
BERNHARD, Jérôme Alfred Escherstrasse 23 CH-8002 Zürich / CH | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Clerc, Natalia, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 08733811.7 | 23.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008CH00185 | Priority number, date | CH20070073407 | 04.05.2007 Original published format: CH 734072007 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008134906 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145162 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01G7/00, G01D5/20, G01L1/14 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G01G7/00 (EP,US);
G01G23/3728 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | WAAGE | [2010/03] | English: | SCALE | [2010/03] | French: | BALANCE | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 06.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2509047 (MICROBO SA [CH]) [Y] 3-5 * page 2, line 1 - line 7 * * page 4, line 17 - line 23; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO02064407 (NWM TRUST MAN LTD [NZ], et al) [Y] 6 * page 10, line 15 - line 31 *; | [XY]EP1279938 (STARR JOHNSON [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010]; figure 1 * [Y] 3-6; | [A]EP1357370 (ESEC TRADING SA [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006056650 (LAPPSET GROUP OY [FI], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [E]WO2008049261 (CARAG AG [CH], et al) [E] 1 * page 5, line 20 - line 32 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 8 * |