30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
14.12.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
06.01.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
28.12.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.12.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.09.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.12.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.08.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.07.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
10.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2010 |
First examination report |
|
12.02.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] |
06.02.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.12.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
11.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
30.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
22.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|