Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2142320 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2012 | B1 | EP2142320 | 13.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH7502007 | 09.05.2007 | WO2008CH00189 | 25.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE544538T | 15.02.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH7502007 | 09.05.2007 | WO2008CH00189 | 25.04.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008138152 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH7502007 | 09.05.2007 |