EP2164567 - PORTABLE IRRADIATING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alplight Industriezone Schächenwald 6460 Altdorf / CH | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISSIG, Alois Dorfstrasse 31 6454 Flüelen / CH | 02 /
ZURFLUH, Erich Frohmattweg 23 6460 Altdorf / CH | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
BISSIG, Alois Dorfstrasse 31 CH-6454 Flüelen / CH | ||
02 /
ZURFLUH, Erich Frohmattweg 23 CH-6460 Altdorf / CH | Representative(s) | Fischer, Britta Ruth E. BLUM & CO. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/12] | Fischer, Britta Ruth E. BLUM & CO. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 08733825.7 | 30.04.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008CH00199 | Priority number, date | CH20070001051 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: CH 10512007 | [2010/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009003295 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2164567 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2164567 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A61B18/20 (EP,US);
A61C1/0046 (EP,US);
A61N2005/063 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0644 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0651 (EP,US);
A61N5/0616 (EP,US);
A61N5/062 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRAGBARE BESTRAHLUNGSANORDNUNG | [2010/12] | English: | PORTABLE IRRADIATING ARRANGEMENT | [2010/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RADIATION PORTABLE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 04.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2008 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MT | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | AT | 30.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | IE | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | LU | 30.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
AT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
AT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
AT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07323093 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]EP1433499 (YAMAN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]US7029193 (CHAO HENRY [TW]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0016]; figure 3 * | Examination | WO9316323 | US2003210542 |