04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
13.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
23.03.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
30.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
22.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
22.07.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
24.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
10.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
03.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
13.08.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
29.07.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.07.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.05.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
03.05.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
08.01.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
24.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.12.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|