Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2150164 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2010 | B1 | EP2150164 | 10.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CH00215 | 14.05.2008 | CH7752007 | 14.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE481028T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CH00215 | 14.05.2008 | CH7752007 | 14.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502008001340D1 | 28.10.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CH00215 | 14.05.2008 | CH7752007 | 14.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008138160 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH7752007 | 14.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2352737T | 22.02.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH7752007 | 14.05.2007 |