EP2144382 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK (PON) FAILURE DETECTION, AS WELL AS PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK (PON) SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Sulin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/24] |
Former [2010/02] | 01 /
YANG, Sulin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08734176.4 | 26.04.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008CN70818 | Priority number, date | CN20071098058 | 26.04.2007 Original published format: CN200710098058 | [2010/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008131690 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144382 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2144382 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/24, H04B10/079, H04Q11/00 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
H04B10/0791 (EP,US);
H04L41/0677 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0067 (EP,US);
H04L43/0847 (EP,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0081 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0083 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | H04L12/26, H04L12/24, H04B10/079 | ||
Former IPC [2010/02] | H04B10/08, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEHLERERKENNUNG IN EINEM PASSIVEN OPTISCHEN NETZWERK SOWIE PASSIVES OPTISCHES NETZWERKSYSTEM | [2010/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK (PON) FAILURE DETECTION, AS WELL AS PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK (PON) SYSTEM | [2010/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT À LA DÉTECTION D'UNE DÉFAILLANCE D'UN RÉSEAU OPTIQUE PASSIF (PON), AINSI QUE SYSTÈME D'UN RÉSEAU OPTIQUE PASSIF (PON) | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2009 | Translation filed | 29.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 05.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2008 | AT | 11.06.2014 | BE | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | IT | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | MT | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20050028460 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]KR20050028460 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [Y]CN1750495 (CHINA MOBILE COMM GROUP CO [CN]); | [X]US2004156635 (FELSKE KENT EVANS [CA], et al); | [A]JP2007027819 (FUJITSU ACCESS LTD); | [A]CN1703008 (FIBERXON CHENGDU TECHNOLOGY IN [CN]) | by applicant | KR20050028460 |