EP2146607 - RECEPTACLE FOR HEATING FOOD BY MEANS OF MICROWAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mühleisen, Michael Ostring 87 26125 Oldenburg / DE | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | von den Steinen, Axel Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | von den Steinen, Axel advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrases 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08734404.0 | 27.03.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008DE00466 | Priority number, date | DE20071019198 | 20.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007019198 | DE20072016537U | 23.11.2007 Original published format: DE 202007016537 U | [2010/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008128493 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146607 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146607 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/08, A47J36/02 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
A47J36/027 (EP);
A47J27/088 (EP);
A47J36/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTNIS ZUM ERWÄRMEN VON NAHRUNGSMITTELN MITTELS MIKROWELLEN | [2010/04] | English: | RECEPTACLE FOR HEATING FOOD BY MEANS OF MICROWAVES | [2010/04] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR RÉCHAUFFER DES ALIMENTS À L'AIDE DE MICRO-ONDES | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.10.2010 | CZ | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | EE | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | HR | 20.10.2010 | HU | 20.10.2010 | IE | 20.10.2010 | IT | 20.10.2010 | LT | 20.10.2010 | LV | 20.10.2010 | MT | 20.10.2010 | NL | 20.10.2010 | PL | 20.10.2010 | RO | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | SI | 20.10.2010 | SK | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | BG | 20.01.2011 | NO | 20.01.2011 | GR | 21.01.2011 | ES | 31.01.2011 | IS | 20.02.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | LU | 27.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
TR | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
LU | 27.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 20.10.2010 | |
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
LU | 27.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
LU | 27.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
MT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 20.10.2010 | |
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
IE | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
HR | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
LV | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
NO | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0971849 (KELLER KARL [CH]) [DA] 1-19* figure 1a *; | [DA]US2006043093 (COX SHIRLEY J [CA], et al) [DA] 1-19 * figures 1,4-6 * |