EP2147138 - DRAWING LINE OR DRAWING UNIT AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/04] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DRAWING LINE OR DRAWING UNIT | ||
[2014/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trützschler Nonwovens GmbH Wolfsgartenstrasse 6 63329 Egelsbach / DE | [2015/23] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Trützschler Nonwovens GmbH Wolfgartenstrasse 6 63329 Egelsbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states Fleissner GmbH Wolfsgartenstrasse 6 63329 Egelsbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Rolf An der Steinkaute 7 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
BREIDERT, Michael Elbestrasse 47 64390 Erzhausen / DE | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2011/38] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08734486.7 | 15.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008DE00663 | Priority number, date | DE20071024350 | 24.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007024350 | [2010/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141602 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147138 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2147138 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D01G1/08, D02J1/22, D01H5/22, D01H5/30 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
D01G1/08 (EP,US);
D01G1/06 (US);
D01H5/22 (EP,US);
D01H5/30 (EP,US);
D02J1/22 (EP,US);
D02J13/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2010/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STRECKWERKSTRASSE BZW.STRECKWERK UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2014/37] | English: | DRAWING LINE OR DRAWING UNIT AND METHOD FOR ITS OPERATION | [2014/37] | French: | LIGNE DE BANCS D'ÉTIRAGE OU UN BANC D'ÉTIRAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2014/37] |
Former [2010/04] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINER STRECKWERKSTRASSE BZW. EINES STRECKWERKS | ||
Former [2010/04] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DRAWING LINE OR DRAWING UNIT | ||
Former [2010/04] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE LIGNE DE BANCS D'ÉTIRAGE OU UN BANC D'ÉTIRAGE | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2008 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | DK | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | HR | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | MT | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | SE | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | BG | 03.09.2015 | NO | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.04.2008 | |
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 03.06.2015 | |
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | HR | 03.06.2015 | |
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | HR | 03.06.2015 | |
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE2148619 (DAVY ASHMORE AG) [YD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0392194 (SKF TEXTILMASCH KOMPONENTEN [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3933839 (SKF TEXTILMASCH KOMPONENTEN [DE]) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [A]DE10343460 (SAURER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0038]; figure 2; claims 1-4 *; | [X]EP1522613 (SSM AG [CH]) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0024] , [0026] , [0027]; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * | Examination | - Leonhard W, Control of Electrical Drives, New York, Springer Verlag, (1985), ISBN 0-387-13650-9 |