18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
01.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
16.03.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
24.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
02.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
25.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
18.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
11.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
04.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
28.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
08.04.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
28.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.10.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.07.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
01.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
18.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
03.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.12.2009 |
New entry: Biological material |
|
31.03.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|